LA HCR140 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends membership of the False River Watershed Council
Title
Amends membership of the False River Watershed Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 140 CONCUR (#1259) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 140 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1403) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 140 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1403) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-05-28 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 100, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024. |
2024-05-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-23 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-05-21 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |