LA HCR138 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Steve Udvarhelyi, M.D., on the occasion of his retirement as president and chief executive officer of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana
Title
Commends Steve Udvarhelyi, M.D., on the occasion of his retirement as president and chief executive officer of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 138 CONCUR (#1080) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-05-28 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-05-20 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |