LA HCR130 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 11-12 adopted by BESE on Feb. 17, 2011
Title
Provides legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 11-12 adopted by BESE on Feb. 17, 2011
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 130, ADOPT (#773) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 130, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#678) (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 130, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#678) (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2011-06-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-20 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-06-20 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-19 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-19 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-19 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-19 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-06-16 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2011-06-16 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 87, nays 4. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-16 | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. | |
2011-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2011. | |
2011-06-14 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2011-06-14 | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-06-02 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-06-01 | Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-05-26 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2011-05-25 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |