LA HCR108 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Economic Development to study and report on cyber-related issues
Title
Directs the Department of Economic Development to study and report on cyber-related issues
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 108 CONCUR (#969) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on HCR 108 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#869) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on HCR 108 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#869) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-08 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 89, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. |