LA HB954 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Status: Introduced on March 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Summary
Allows for the Grande Isle Port Commission to appoint and pay port and harbor police
Title
Allows for the Grande Isle Port Commission to appoint and pay port and harbor police
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Withdrawn prior to introduction. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |