LA HB95 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-17 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits Family Independence Temporary Assistance Program (FITAP) benefits from being drawn at ATMs, utilized for the purchase of alcohol or tobacco, and remitted at gaming establishments and sexually oriented businesses (RE1 +$454,000 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits Family Independence Temporary Assistance Program (FITAP) benefits from being drawn at ATMs, utilized for the purchase of alcohol or tobacco, and remitted at gaming establishments and sexually oriented businesses (RE1 +$454,000 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 95, FINAL PASSAGE (#366) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 95, APPROPRIATIONS (#365) (Y: 36 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-17 Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2012-05-17 Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
2012-05-16 Reported with amendments.
2012-04-18 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2012-04-17 Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2012-04-16 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2012-04-09 Scheduled for floor debate on 4/16/2012.
2012-04-05 Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2012-04-04 Reported with amendments (14-3) (Regular).
2012-03-12 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2012-02-17 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/10/2012.
2012-02-10 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2012-02-10 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback