LA HB942 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the portion of the Intracoastal Waterway Gulf Outlet Bridge on Highway 47, in Orleans Parish, as the "Governor David C. Treen Green Bridge"
Title
Designates the portion of the Intracoastal Waterway Gulf Outlet Bridge on Highway 47, in Orleans Parish, as the "Governor David C. Treen Green Bridge"
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bayham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2024. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |