LA HB927 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a tuition increase at Louisiana State University Laboratory School and Southern University Laboratory School
Title
Authorizes a tuition increase at Louisiana State University Laboratory School and Southern University Laboratory School
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 927 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1681) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 927 ADOPT (#1415) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 927 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1252) (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 927 FINAL PASSAGE (#952) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 927 FINAL PASSAGE (#809) (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 927 FINAL PASSAGE (#687) (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 927 FINAL PASSAGE (#687) (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 927 ADOPT (#1415) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 927 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1252) (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 927 FINAL PASSAGE (#952) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 927 FINAL PASSAGE (#809) (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 927 FINAL PASSAGE (#687) (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 927 FINAL PASSAGE (#687) (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 521. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2022-06-05 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2022-06-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Selders, Harris, and Freiberg. |
2022-06-02 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Jackson, Foil, and Talbot. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 69, nays 27, the House refused to concur in the amendments proposed by the Senate. |
2022-05-26 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 16. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2022. |
2022-05-10 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2022-05-09 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 28. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2022. |
2022-04-28 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |