LA HB895 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for asbestos abatement
Title
Provides for asbestos abatement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 895, FINAL PASSAGE (#1124) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 895, FINAL PASSAGE (#338) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 895, FINAL PASSAGE (#338) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 295. | |
2010-06-09 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-09 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-08 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-26 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-25 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-24 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-26 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-15 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-04-14 | Reported favorably (11-0-1) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled. |