LA HB848 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides funding to the Executive Department, office of elderly affairs for the parish councils on aging and provides funding to the Department of Veterans Affairs for operating expenses
Title
Provides funding to the Executive Department, office of elderly affairs for the parish councils on aging and provides funding to the Department of Veterans Affairs for operating expenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HB848 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=688308 |