LA HB835 | 2015 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB194
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date: June 23, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date: June 23, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the examination, treatment, and billing of victims of sexually-oriented criminal offenses
Title
Provides relative to the examination, treatment, and billing of victims of sexually-oriented criminal offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 835 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#685) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 835 CO-AUTHORS (#530) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 835 FINAL PASSAGE (#529) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 835 AMENDMENT # 2614 BY CLAITOR HB 835 BY MORENO (#528) (Y: 7 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 835 FINAL PASSAGE (#339) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 835 CO-AUTHORS (#530) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 835 FINAL PASSAGE (#529) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 835 AMENDMENT # 2614 BY CLAITOR HB 835 BY MORENO (#528) (Y: 7 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 835 FINAL PASSAGE (#339) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | Effective date: June 23, 2015. |
2015-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 229. |
2015-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2015. |
2015-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015. |
2015-05-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-05 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 194 reported by the Committee on Judiciary (18-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB194 (Replaces) 2015-05-05 - Becomes HB 835.