LA HB834 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to a sports wagering account and presumptions of abandonment (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to a sports wagering account and presumptions of abandonment (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. John Illg [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 834 FINAL PASSAGE (#1184) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 834 FINAL PASSAGE (#380) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 834 FINAL PASSAGE (#380) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 510. |
2022-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2022. |
2022-04-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported with amendments (18-0). |
2022-03-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-03-17 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |