LA HB83 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 61-31-1)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Effective date: 11/05/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 61-31-1)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Effective date: 11/05/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to student discipline (Item #42)
Title
Provides relative to student discipline (Item #42)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Vote on HB 83 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#228) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 83 CO-AUTHORS (#168) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 83 HB 83 BY ROMERO (#167) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 83 AMENDMENT # 814 BY CONNICK HB 83 BY ROMERO (#166) (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HB 83 FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 83 CO-AUTHORS (#168) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 83 HB 83 BY ROMERO (#167) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 83 AMENDMENT # 814 BY CONNICK HB 83 BY ROMERO (#166) (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HB 83 FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | House | Effective date: 11/05/2020. |
2020-11-05 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 48. |
2020-10-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-21 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-10-21 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-21 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-10-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20. |
2020-10-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-12 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-12 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2020-10-05 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |