LA HB824 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates and provides for a program to provide state funding for the education of students not enrolled in a public school (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates and provides for a program to provide state funding for the education of students not enrolled in a public school (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-06 | House | Reported with amendments (8-3). |
2022-03-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-16 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |