LA HB785 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-01 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-01 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the qualification of a newspaper to publish official proceedings, legal notices, or advertisements in Orleans or Jefferson Parish
Title
Provides relative to the qualification of a newspaper to publish official proceedings, legal notices, or advertisements in Orleans or Jefferson Parish
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2014-03-31 | House | Read by title. |
2014-03-03 | House | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |
2014-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2014-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |