LA HB78 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-13 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-13 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes agreements between political subdivisions and taxpayers that may provide for certain payments in lieu of ad valorem taxes (Item #65) (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes agreements between political subdivisions and taxpayers that may provide for certain payments in lieu of ad valorem taxes (Item #65) (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-12 - House - House Vote on HB 78 FINAL PASSAGE (#66) (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - House - House Vote on HB 78 AMENDMENT # 455 BY MINCEY MOTION TO ADOPT (#65) (Y: 45 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - House - House Vote on HB 78 AMENDMENT # 455 BY MINCEY MOTION TO ADOPT (#65) (Y: 45 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2020-10-12 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-12 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-10-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/12/20. |
2020-10-06 | House | Notice given. |
2020-10-06 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-10-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/06/20. |
2020-10-05 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-05 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-05 | House | Reported favorably (8-6). |
2020-10-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |