LA HB775 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for methods of determining income subject to the corporation income tax (EG INCREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for methods of determining income subject to the corporation income tax (EG INCREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-01HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2015-06-01HouseCalled from the calendar.
2015-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/01/2015.
2015-05-28HouseNotice given.
2015-05-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2015.
2015-05-27HouseNotice given.
2015-05-05HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2015-05-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015.
2015-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-04-28HouseReported favorably (15-0).
2015-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2015-04-03HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2015-04-03HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback