LA HB747 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to judicial compensation (EG +$6,990,110 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides with respect to judicial compensation (EG +$6,990,110 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported favorably (18-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-03-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-03-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |