LA HB707 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 16. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 16. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes fees for licensure as a real estate appraisal management company
Title
Establishes fees for licensure as a real estate appraisal management company
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 707, FINAL PASSAGE (#1046) (Y: 64 N: 16 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 707, FINAL PASSAGE (#900) (Y: 65 N: 18 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 707, FINAL PASSAGE (#900) (Y: 65 N: 18 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 16. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. | |
2010-05-26 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 26, 2010. | |
2010-05-19 | Notice given. | |
2010-05-19 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | |
2010-05-18 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 18. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. | |
2010-05-18 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 18, 2010. | |
2010-05-11 | Notice given. | |
2010-05-11 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 11, 2010. | |
2010-05-05 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-04 | Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-17 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-17 | Prefiled. |