LA HB706 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Becomes HB 839.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Becomes HB 839.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a limitation of liability for certain facilities operated by nonprofit youth organizations
Title
Provides a limitation of liability for certain facilities operated by nonprofit youth organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Becomes HB 839. |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported by substitute (12-0-1). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |