LA HB7 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Effective date: 06/23/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for a sales and use tax exemption for feminine hygiene products and diapers (EN -$11,100,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a sales and use tax exemption for feminine hygiene products and diapers (EN -$11,100,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 7 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1245) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 7 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1245) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 7 ADOPT (#1116) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 7 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1245) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 7 TO CONSIDER (#1201) (Y: 45 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 7 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1084) (Y: 51 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 7 CO-AUTHORS (#883) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 7 FINAL PASSAGE (#882) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 7 FINAL PASSAGE (#683) (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23HouseEffective date: 06/23/2021.
2021-06-23HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 449.
2021-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-10SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-10HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-10SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays.
2021-06-10HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 63, nays 36. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2021-06-10HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-06-10HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-06-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/10/2021.
2021-06-09HouseBy a vote of 45 yeas, 54 nays, the House refused to suspend the rules to consider the Conference Committee report.
2021-06-09HouseConference Committee report received.
2021-06-09HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-09SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Jackson, Reese, and Smith.
2021-06-09SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-06-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Freeman, Bishop, and Magee.
2021-06-08SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2021-06-08HouseConference committee appointment pending.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 51, nays 42, the House refused to concur in the amendments proposed by the Senate.
2021-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-02SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-27SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2021-05-26SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-25HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-25HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2021.
2021-05-24HouseNotice given.
2021-05-24HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-24HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021.
2021-05-20HouseNotice given.
2021-05-20HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-20HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021.
2021-05-18HouseNotice given.
2021-05-18HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-18HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021.
2021-05-17HouseNotice given.
2021-05-17HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-17HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2021.
2021-05-13HouseNotice given.
2021-05-13HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-13HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-12HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021.
2021-05-12HouseNotice given.
2021-05-12HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-12HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021.
2021-05-10HouseNotice given.
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-03HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-02-12HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/12/2021.
2021-02-09HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-02-09HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB7&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1199256
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219725
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228037
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234653
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236010
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220883
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230592
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230765
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1199263
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1209282
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219994
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222636
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228114
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230270
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230789
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231923
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232916
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234040
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234838
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235073
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1238792
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228040
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232552
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232554
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233235
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234100
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234535
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234554
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234692
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234721

Bill Comments

feedback