LA HB681 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the definition of "technical violation" for the purposes of imposition of administrative sanctions and probation violations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends the definition of "technical violation" for the purposes of imposition of administrative sanctions and probation violations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 681 FINAL PASSAGE (#1249) (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 681 FINAL PASSAGE (#372) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-12HouseEffective date: August 1, 2014.
2014-06-12HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 633.
2014-05-27HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2014-05-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2014-05-22HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2014-05-21HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2014-05-21SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 7 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2014-05-15SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2014-05-14SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2014-05-13SenateReported favorably.
2014-04-15SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2014-04-14SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2014-04-10HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2014-04-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2014.
2014-04-03HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-04-02HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2014-03-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2014-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2014-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback