LA HB680 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Major Events Incentive Program Fund and Louisiana Economic Development (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Major Events Incentive Program Fund and Louisiana Economic Development (EG1 SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 680 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1357) (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 680 FINAL PASSAGE (#1305) (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 680 FINAL PASSAGE (#155) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 680 FINAL PASSAGE (#1305) (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 680 FINAL PASSAGE (#155) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 689. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-17 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/18/18. |
2018-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18. |
2018-03-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |