LA HB670 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an increase in certain fees collected by the Department of Environmental Quality (EN +$2,003,044 SG RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes an increase in certain fees collected by the Department of Environmental Quality (EN +$2,003,044 SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 670 FINAL PASSAGE (#876) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on HB 670 FINAL PASSAGE (#757) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on HB 670 FINAL PASSAGE (#757) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2021. |
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 405. |
2021-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 18. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. |
2021-05-18 | House | Notice removed |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-18 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2021-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021. |
2021-05-17 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-13 | House | Notice removed |
2021-05-13 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-13 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021. |
2021-05-12 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021. |
2021-04-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2021-04-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2021-04-15 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |