LA HB660 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB724
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Becomes HB No. 724.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Becomes HB No. 724.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for policies, procedures, and programs relative to school prayer, the pledge of allegiance, and instruction regarding the pilgrim fathers and the U.S. flag in certain school districts
Title
Provides for policies, procedures, and programs relative to school prayer, the pledge of allegiance, and instruction regarding the pilgrim fathers and the U.S. flag in certain school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | House | Becomes HB No. 724. |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported by substitute (15-0) (Regular) |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
HB724 (Replaced by) 2013-06-14 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.