LA HB629 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to individual income tax, corporation income tax, corporation franchise tax, and ad valorem tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to individual income tax, corporation income tax, corporation franchise tax, and ad valorem tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-04HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-04-26HouseNotice given.
2021-04-26HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-04-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2021.
2021-04-22HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-21HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback