LA HB612 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB16
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a physical exam that meets or exceeds national standards for purposes of membership in the Firefighters' Retirement System (EN DECREASE APV)
Title
Requires a physical exam that meets or exceeds national standards for purposes of membership in the Firefighters' Retirement System (EN DECREASE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 612 FINAL PASSAGE (#503) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 612 FINAL PASSAGE (#218) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 612 FINAL PASSAGE (#218) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2019. |
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 254. |
2019-05-29 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/19. |
2019-04-30 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 16 reported by the Committee on Retirement (6-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB16 (Replaces) 2019-04-29 - Becomes HB 612.