LA HB595 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-20 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-20 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the homestead exemption and special assessment level for property damaged or destroyed by a disaster under certain circumstances (RE1 INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Extends the homestead exemption and special assessment level for property damaged or destroyed by a disaster under certain circumstances (RE1 INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 595, FINAL PASSAGE (#1879) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 595, FINAL PASSAGE (#609) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 595, FINAL PASSAGE (#609) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-20 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-06-18 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2010. | |
2010-06-18 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-18 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-17 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-16 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-15 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-05-11 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2010-05-10 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-05 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-05 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-05 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 5, 2010. | |
2010-04-28 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-27 | Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-16 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2010-03-16 | Prefiled. |