LA HB592 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Effective date: 08/01/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority to incur debt or issue bonds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority to incur debt or issue bonds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 592 FINAL PASSAGE (#370) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 592 FINAL PASSAGE (#154) (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-05HouseEffective date: 08/01/20.
2020-06-05HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 89.
2020-06-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-05-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-27HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-27HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-26SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-21SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 5. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback