LA HB589 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the governing authorities of municipalities to regulate the accumulation of waste tires on residential property
Title
Authorizes the governing authorities of municipalities to regulate the accumulation of waste tires on residential property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 589 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#814) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 589 FINAL PASSAGE (#649) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 589 FINAL PASSAGE (#376) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 589 FINAL PASSAGE (#649) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 589 FINAL PASSAGE (#376) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-22 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 354. |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17. |
2017-05-16 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-15 | House | Notice removed |
2017-05-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/17. |
2017-05-09 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/17. |
2017-05-01 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably (18-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |