LA HB575 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-14 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-14 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the disbursement of funds for the loss of life opportunities of wrongfully convicted persons (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the disbursement of funds for the loss of life opportunities of wrongfully convicted persons (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 575, FINAL PASSAGE (#764) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2012-05-10 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-05-09 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-09 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-05-02 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2012. | |
2012-05-02 | Notice given. | |
2012-04-30 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-04-23 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/30/2012. | |
2012-04-19 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-18 | Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-01 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled. |