LA HB571 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to alcoholic beverage delivery

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to alcoholic beverage delivery

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 571 FINAL PASSAGE (#856) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 571 FINAL PASSAGE (#324) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-07-20HouseVeto message read. Lies over under the rules.
2021-07-01HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2021-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-26SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-25SenateReported favorably.
2021-05-12SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2021-05-11SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-10HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021.
2021-05-03HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-29HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB571&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212040
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219257
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222875
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232957
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216830
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219191
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218860
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222637
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232311
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212051
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219343
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222950
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236628
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237079
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222814
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232348

Bill Comments

feedback