LA HB57 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Authorizes the legislature to provide by law for the collection of all sales and use taxes imposed by any taxing authority in the state (OR SEE FISC NOTE)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Authorizes the legislature to provide by law for the collection of all sales and use taxes imposed by any taxing authority in the state (OR SEE FISC NOTE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-15 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2019. |
2019-03-13 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-13 | House | Prefiled. |