LA HB57 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: May 20 @ 9:30 am in Room 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Authorizes the legislature to provide by law for the collection of all sales and use taxes imposed by any taxing authority in the state (OR SEE FISC NOTE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Authorizes the legislature to provide by law for the collection of all sales and use taxes imposed by any taxing authority in the state (OR SEE FISC NOTE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-15HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2019.
2019-03-13HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-13HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback