LA HB567 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the marijuana tax levied on certain dealers and repeals provisions related to tax stamps which evidence payment of tax (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Repeals the marijuana tax levied on certain dealers and repeals provisions related to tax stamps which evidence payment of tax (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |