LA HB533 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the composition and qualifications of the board of commissioners of the Red River, Atchafalaya, and Bayou Boeuf Levee District
Title
Changes the composition and qualifications of the board of commissioners of the Red River, Atchafalaya, and Bayou Boeuf Levee District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 533 ADOPT (#1007) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 533 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1193) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 533 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1094) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 533 FINAL PASSAGE (#748) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 533 AMENDMENT # 2792 BY WOMACK HB 533 BY JOHNSON M. (#747) (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 533 FINAL PASSAGE (#252) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 533 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1193) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 533 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1094) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 533 FINAL PASSAGE (#748) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 533 AMENDMENT # 2792 BY WOMACK HB 533 BY JOHNSON M. (#747) (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 533 FINAL PASSAGE (#252) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2023. |
2023-06-14 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 372. |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 2 nays. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 61, nays 37. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2023-06-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/2023. |
2023-06-07 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2023-06-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Mike Johnson, Wright, and Larvadain. |
2023-06-07 | House | Notice of change of Senate conferees. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee membership changed: Bernard vice McMath. |
2023-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: McMath, Luneau, and Cloud. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2023-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2023-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023. |
2023-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-08 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/2023. |
2023-05-03 | House | Notice given. |
2023-05-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-04-27 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-04-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2023. |
2023-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2023-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |