LA HB529 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to retention of first-year students at public institutions of postsecondary education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to retention of first-year students at public institutions of postsecondary education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-25 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2011-04-18 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
2011-04-15 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2011-04-15 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback