LA HB525 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective date: June 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relative to aid to needy families and employment services for TANF cash assistance recipients (RE NO IMPACT FF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relative to aid to needy families and employment services for TANF cash assistance recipients (RE NO IMPACT FF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 525 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#731) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 525 FINAL PASSAGE (#656) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 525, FINAL PASSAGE (#53) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14HouseEffective date: June 14, 2013.
2013-06-14HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 285.
2013-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2013-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2013-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2013-06-02HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2013-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 6/02/2013.
2013-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2013-05-28SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-05-16SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-05-15SenateReported favorably.
2013-04-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2013-04-18SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2013-04-17HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2013-04-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 4/17/2013.
2013-04-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2013-04-11HouseReported with amendments (16-0) (Regular).
2013-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2013-04-01HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
2013-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2013-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=13rs&b=HB525&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=835151
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=837369
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839625
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=854201
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=857456
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=836779
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=837331
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=837561
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839424
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839232
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=851916
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=854137
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=835194
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=837200
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=837446
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839145
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839667
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=842399
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=848992
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=860186
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839427
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=851683

Bill Comments

feedback