LA HB495 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows full practice authority for advanced practice registered nurses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows full practice authority for advanced practice registered nurses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 495 FINAL PASSAGE (#269) (Y: 61 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 495 FINAL PASSAGE (#269) (Y: 61 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 495 AMENDMENT # 2407 BY PRESSLY MOTION TO ADOPT (#268) (Y: 24 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended.
2021-05-25SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-24SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-20SenateReported with amendments.
2021-05-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-05HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 41. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-05HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
2021-05-03HouseNotice given.
2021-05-03HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-26HouseReported with amendments (10-6-1).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB495&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211606
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217213
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221676
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214667
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217115
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217641
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220991
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221550
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221505
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221476
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226218
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225044
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226041
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227732
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227844
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211613
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217499
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221723
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226588
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221574
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221603
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221638

Bill Comments

feedback