LA HB493 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-03 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a reinspection fee for facilities and establishments with sanitary code violations (EN +$13,800 SG RV See Note)
Title
Establishes a reinspection fee for facilities and establishments with sanitary code violations (EN +$13,800 SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Tanner Magee [R] | Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R] | Rep. Dodie Horton [R] | Rep. Jerome Richard [I] |
Rep. Joseph Stagni [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 493 FINAL PASSAGE (#464) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 493 FINAL PASSAGE (#182) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 493 FINAL PASSAGE (#182) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-03 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2017-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 66. |
2017-05-25 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-24 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-23 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |