LA HB47 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-12 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-12 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redesignates a portion of Louisiana Highway 563 in Lincoln Parish as the "Johnny Lynn Cole Memorial Highway"
Title
Redesignates a portion of Louisiana Highway 563 in Lincoln Parish as the "Johnny Lynn Cole Memorial Highway"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction. |
2021-03-05 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2021. |
2021-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |