LA HB463 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date: 6/30/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date: 6/30/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Re-creates the Department of Justice
Title
Re-creates the Department of Justice
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Egan [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 463 ADOPT (#1423) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 463 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1701) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 463 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1375) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 463 FINAL PASSAGE (#307) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 463 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1701) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 463 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1375) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 463 FINAL PASSAGE (#307) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | House | Effective date: 6/30/2024. |
2024-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 619. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-05-31 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2024-05-31 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2024-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2024. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2024-05-30 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-05-28 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Connick, Coussan, and Reese. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2024-05-23 | House | House conferees appointed: Egan, Robby Carter, and Villio. |
2024-05-23 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2024-05-23 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/23/2024. |
2024-05-20 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/08/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |