LA HB460 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes an income and corporate franchise tax credit for purchase and installation of surveillance cameras in certain commercial vehicles (EG DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an income and corporate franchise tax credit for purchase and installation of surveillance cameras in certain commercial vehicles (EG DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-01HouseNotice removed
2019-05-01HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-04-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/01/19.
2019-04-24HouseNotice given.
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/24/19.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-16HouseReported with amendments (17-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB460&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121750
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125056
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124206
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124817
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126749
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126924
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126947
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129575
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121764
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124231
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125197
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125620

Bill Comments

feedback