LA HB454 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to animal shelters

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to animal shelters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 454 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1044) (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 454 ADOPT (#1033) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 454 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#978) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 454 FINAL PASSAGE (#878) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 454 FINAL PASSAGE (#353) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-06-20HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 383.
2019-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-06SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 5. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2019-06-06HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-06SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee report received.
2019-06-05HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-05SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Thompson, and Allain.
2019-06-05SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-06-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Zeringue, Schexnayder, and Magee.
2019-06-04SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2019-06-04HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2019-06-04HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-06-04HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-06-03HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/04/19.
2019-06-03HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-03SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-29SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-28SenateReported with amendments.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-05-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-02HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB454&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121727
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130405
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143544
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144618
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129549
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130288
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138229
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139804
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142252
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142621
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121751
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130686
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138307
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143497
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1147278
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1147435
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134753
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141681
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143512
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143525

Bill Comments

feedback