LA HB450 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the possession of driver's licenses and special identification cards (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the possession of driver's licenses and special identification cards (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 450 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1237) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 450 FINAL PASSAGE (#916) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 450 FINAL PASSAGE (#142) (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 450 FINAL PASSAGE (#916) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 450 FINAL PASSAGE (#142) (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-28 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 552. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2018-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-15 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 2. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/18. |
2018-03-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |