LA HB443 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for individual income tax credits for donations made to school tuition organizations (EG1 -$705,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for individual income tax credits for donations made to school tuition organizations (EG1 -$705,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 443 FINAL PASSAGE (#159) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021. |
2021-04-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |