LA HB434 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the board of commissioners of Vermilion Parish Hospital Service District No. 3
Title
Provides relative to the board of commissioners of Vermilion Parish Hospital Service District No. 3
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 434 FINAL PASSAGE (#583) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 434 FINAL PASSAGE (#111) (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 434 FINAL PASSAGE (#111) (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 94. |
2018-05-01 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-04-27 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/22/18. |
2018-03-19 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |