LA HB42 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Oct 19 @ 1:00 pm in Room E
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes parents to appeal a local school board's denial of school enrollment requests to the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education (Item #42)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes parents to appeal a local school board's denial of school enrollment requests to the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education (Item #42)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - House - House Vote on HB 42 FINAL PASSAGE (#130) (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-14SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-10-14HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-14HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-10-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/14/20.
2020-10-13HouseNotice given.
2020-10-13HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-10-12HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20.
2020-10-12HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-12HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-12HouseReported favorably (15-0).
2020-09-28HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=HB42&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189344
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191672
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192676
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191308
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192358
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192609
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193235
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193049
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189345
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191673
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192725
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192621

Bill Comments

feedback