LA HB41 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Becomes HB 1083.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Becomes HB 1083.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to race and national origin discrimination in education, employment, public accommodations, and housing options
Title
Provides relative to race and national origin discrimination in education, employment, public accommodations, and housing options
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | House | Becomes HB 1083. |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported by substitute (8-6-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-02-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/4/2022. |
2022-02-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-02-02 | House | Prefiled. |