LA HB390 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Becomes HB 747.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Becomes HB 747.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the seventy-two-hour waiting period before performing a marriage ceremony
Title
Repeals the seventy-two-hour waiting period before performing a marriage ceremony
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Becomes HB 747. |
2018-03-27 | House | Reported by substitute (6-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |